MA H4134 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Reported, in part, by H3359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Election Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-06HouseReported, in part, by H3359
2016-03-30HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2016-03-30HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2016-03-30HouseAccompanied by S373, S374, S375, S376, S377, S378, S379, S380, S381, S382, S383, S384, S385, S387, S388, S389, S390, S391, S392, S393, S394, H536, H537, H538, H539, H540, H544, H545, H546, H547, H548, H549, H550, H551, H552, H553, H554, H555, H556, H557, H558, H559, H560, H561, H562, H563, H564, H565, H566, H568, H569, H570, H571, H572, H574, H575, H576, H577, H578, H579, H580, H581, H582, H583, H584, H586, H589, H590, H591, H592, H593, H594, H595, H596, H597, H598, H599, H600, H601, H604, H606, H607, H608, H609, H610, H611, H612, H613, H616, H3230, H3231, H3233, H3359, H3406, H3407, H3408 and H3409
2016-03-30HouseReported from the committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S373 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S374 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S375 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S376 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S377 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S378 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S379 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S380 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S381 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S382 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S383 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S384 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S385 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S387 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S388 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S389 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S390 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S391 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S392 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S393 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S394 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H536 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H537 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H538 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H539 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H540 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H544 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H545 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H546 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H547 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H548 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H549 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H550 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H551 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H552 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H553 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H554 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H555 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H556 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H557 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H558 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H559 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H560 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H561 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H562 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H563 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H564 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H565 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H566 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H568 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H569 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H570 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H571 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H572 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H574 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H577 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H578 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H579 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H580 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H581 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H582 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H583 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H584 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H586 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H589 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H590 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H591 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H592 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H593 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H594 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H595 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H596 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H597 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H598 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H599 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H600 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H601 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H604 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H606 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H607 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H608 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H609 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H610 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H611 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H612 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H613 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H616 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3230 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3231 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3233 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3359 (Replaces) 2016-05-31 - Placed on file
H3406 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3407 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3408 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3409 (Replaces) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H4647 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2364 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4126 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4022 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2016
H4328 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback