MA H549 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4134
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. DiZoglio of Methuen, a petition of Diana DiZoglio and others that public school students of voting age be instructed on the voter registration process and provided access to voter registration forms. Election Laws.
Title
To increase voter education and registration in public schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4134 |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4134 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Reported, in part, by H3359
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H549 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H549.pdf |