MA H563 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize poll workers in local and state elections to participate in early voting or absentee voting. Election Laws.
Title
To provide poll workers ample time to vote
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4134 |
2015-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4134 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Reported, in part, by H3359
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H563 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H563.pdf |