MA H3409 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4134

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further define felony convictions as relates to the disqualification of voters. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the qualification of voters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4134
2016-01-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/19/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H4134 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Reported, in part, by H3359
H2044 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2043 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2042 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
H3071 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1865 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback