MA H2042 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4414

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to improving environmental conditions to reduce asthma in schools. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to improving asthma in schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-20HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4414
2016-03-16SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-14HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-05-27JointHearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4414 (Replaced by) 2016-07-23 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
H2044 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2043 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3071 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1865 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1864 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback