MA H1865 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4606

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-6)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require owners of rented or foreclosed properties to check for abandoned animals. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting abandoned animals in vacant properties

Sponsors

Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Rep. Dennis Rosa [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. James Miceli [D]Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]
Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]Rep. Timothy Madden [D]
Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Keiko Orrall [R]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. James Dwyer [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kevin Kuros [R]
Rep. Brian Mannal [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Jerald Parisella [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]
Rep. Frank Smizik [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Theodore Speliotis [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Timothy Toomey [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4606
2016-01-19JointHearing rescheduled to 01/21/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2016-01-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/21/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4606 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2044 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2043 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2042 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
H3071 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1864 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback