MA H4606 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 12 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Investigation and study of certain House documents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investigation and study of certain House documents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-12HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2016-09-12HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2016-09-12HouseAccompanied by H424, H1826, H1827, H1828, H1833, H1834, H1836, H1837, H1838, H1841, H1842, H1843, H1847, H1848, H1849, H1850, H1856, H1857, H1865, H1868, H1870, H1873, H1875, H1877, H2957, H3266, H3462, H3464, H3572, H3767 and H3803
2016-09-12HouseReported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H424 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1826 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1827 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1828 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1833 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1834 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1836 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1837 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1838 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1841 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1842 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1843 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1847 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1848 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1849 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1850 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1856 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1857 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1865 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1868 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1870 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1873 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1875 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1877 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H2957 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H3266 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H3462 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H3464 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H3572 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H3767 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H3803 (Replaces) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H3363 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3612
H3681 (Similar To) 2015-08-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3682 (Similar To) 2015-12-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2015
S2037 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2016
S2174 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2375

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback