MA H1849 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4606
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote municipal collaboration and regionalization throughout the Commonwealth. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To promote municipal collaboration and regionalization throughout the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4606 |
2015-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4606 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H573 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
H573 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1849 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1849.pdf |