MA H573 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to vacancies in the office of Governor or Lieutenant-Governor. Election Laws.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution A Proposal for an amendment to the Constitution relative to a vacancy in the office of Governor or Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on file |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on file |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2015-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
H2568 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3779
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
H2568 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3779
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H573 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H573.pdf |