MA H1856 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4606

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to withhold unrestricted general government aid to cities and towns that self designate themselves as sanctuary cities or towns or fail to enforce the federal immigration laws. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sanctuary cities and towns

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4606
2015-12-03JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4606 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2596 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2780 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3320 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H524 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
H1052 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback