MA H3320 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4084

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing an appropriation for the environmental clean-up, mitigation and other operating costs of the Solomon Post 8819 for Veterans of Foreign Wars in the town of Billerica. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the VFW Solomon Post 8819 in the town of Billerica

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4084
2015-11-18JointHearing rescheduled to 11/18/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2015-11-10JointHearing scheduled for 11/18/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H4084 (Replaced by) 2016-03-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2596 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1856 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H2780 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H524 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
H1052 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback