MA H524 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4484

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the elimination of nursing home fees. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative the elimination of nursing home fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-11HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4484
2015-10-15JointHearing rescheduled to 10/19/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-10-14JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H4484 (Replaced by) 2016-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2596 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1856 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H2780 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3320 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H1052 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback