MA H2780 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation has been replaced by H4102

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize public bodies to meet in executive sessions to consider certain requests for proposals, purchase orders, bids and other solicitations of third party services. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further defining executive sessions held by public bodies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-21HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4102
2015-10-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback