MA H4102 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State administration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07HouseReported, in part, by H3889
2016-03-23HouseReported, in part, by H2774
2016-03-21HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2016-03-21HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2016-03-21HouseAccompanied by H13, H2707, H2708, H2710, H2711, H2712, H2714, H2715, H2716, H2717, H2720, H2721, H2722, H2723, H2724, H2725, H2728, H2731, H2733, H2734, H2740, H2741, H2746, H2748, H2751, H2752, H2753, H2754, H2755, H2758, H2759, H2761, H2762, H2763, H2764, H2765, H2766, H2770, H2774, H2775, H2776, H2777, H2778, H2780, H2781, H2783, H2785, H2786, H2787, H2788, H2789, H2792, H2798, H2799, H2800, H2801, H2804, H2806, H2807, H2815, H2816, H2821, H2822, H2827, H2828, H2832, H2833, H2834, H2841, H2842, H2844, H2846, H3301, H3303, H3304, H3517, H3518, H3519, H3523, H3690, H3697, H3728 and H3889
2016-03-21HouseReported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H13 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2707 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2708 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2710 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2711 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2712 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2714 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2715 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2716 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2717 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2720 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2721 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2722 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2723 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2724 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2725 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2728 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2731 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2733 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2734 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2740 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2741 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2746 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2748 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2751 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2752 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2753 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2754 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2755 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2758 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2759 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2761 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2762 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2763 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2764 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2765 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2766 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2770 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2774 (Replaces) 2016-05-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2775 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2776 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2777 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2778 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2780 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2781 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2783 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2785 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2786 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2787 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2788 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2789 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2792 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2798 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2799 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2800 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2801 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2804 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2806 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2807 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2815 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2816 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2821 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2822 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2827 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2828 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2832 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2833 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2834 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2841 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2842 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2844 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2846 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3301 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3303 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3304 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3517 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3518 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3519 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3523 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3690 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3697 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3728 (Replaces) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3889 (Replaces) 2016-06-30 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3665 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see H3858
S1990 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - New draft substituted, see S2474
H3762 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2016
S2056 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - New draft substituted, see S2353
S2133 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2406

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback