MA H2807 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To maintain the integrity of the public records law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
H2391 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1553 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2171 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2172 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2392 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2391 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1553 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2171 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2172 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2392 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2807 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2807.pdf |