MA H2774 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the deliberations of public bodies at town meetings from the open meeting law. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To exempt the deliberation of public bodies at town meeting from the open meeting law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-05-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-05-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-03-23 | House | Recommitted to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2774.pdf |