MA H2833 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the placement of advertisements on websites of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission to conduct an investigation and study relative to permitting advertising on state websites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2074 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2074 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2833 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2833.pdf |