MA H2073 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4638

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to improvements in the delivery of prescription drug benefits. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission to study and recommend improvements in the delivery of prescription drug benefits for the citizens of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4638
2016-03-16SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-14HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-11-20JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 and A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4638 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2074 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3106 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback