MA H2074 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4242
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the rights of patients to certain bulk medications upon discharge from medical facilities. Public Health.
Title
Relative to patients rights
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4242 |
2015-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3106 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H500 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1772 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H3105 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2073 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H3106 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2074 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2074.pdf |