MA H2799 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the biennial review of rules and regulations with an economic impact on small businesses. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Increasing review of rules and regulations with economic impacts on small businesses
Sponsors
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. Leah Cole [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] | Rep. Marc Lombardo [R] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
H1520 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H591 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H1755 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1754 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H108 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1520 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H591 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H1755 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1754 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H108 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2799 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2799.pdf |