MA H3697 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Orleans be authorized to use certain parcels of state owned land for wastewater purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Orleans to use certain land of the commonwealth of Massachusetts under the control of the department of transportation highway division for wastewater disposal
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-07-29 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2015-07-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3697 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3697.pdf |