MA H2758 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate certain law enforcement records as public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To provide for the public inspection of records made or received by special state police officers at educational institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
H999 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
H1107 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H1844 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3014 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied H3095
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
H999 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
H1107 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H1844 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3014 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied H3095
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2758 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2758.pdf |