CA SB1057 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Jul 2 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Jul 2 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 749.22 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juvenile justice coordinating council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1057 Menjivar et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4142.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3969.) (May 16). |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3730.) (April 23). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 749.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |