MA H1052 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4228

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Lombardo of Billerica, a petition of Marc T. Lombardo and others that veterans of the armed services be considered residents for the purpose of admission and tuition expenses for state colleges, community colleges or universities. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to tuition for U.S. Veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4228
2015-09-09JointHearing scheduled for 10/07/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H4228 (Replaced by) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2596 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1856 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H2780 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H3320 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H524 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback