MA H3464 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4606
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the use of benefits granted with the issuance of special permits by a municipality to areas throughout said municipality. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Enhancing the utilization of certain mitigation funds
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] | Rep. Marc Lombardo [R] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4606 |
2015-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4606 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2916 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2916 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3464 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3464.pdf |