MA H2916 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4177
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require deposits on certain non-carbonated beverage containers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To expand the bottle bill
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. John Fernandes [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4177 |
2015-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4177 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H493 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H493 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2916 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2916.pdf |