MA S2174 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1072
Note: Legislation replaced by S2375
Note: Legislation replaced by S2375
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2375
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2375
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect abandoned animals in vacant properties,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2174).
Title
Protecting abandoned animals in vacant properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | New draft substituted, as amended, see S2375 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, June 28, 2016 with an amendment, see S2375 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-03-14 | Senate | New draft of S1072 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1072 (Replaces) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2174
S2375 (Replaced by) 2016-07-28 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H4442 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S947 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S942 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S2375 (Replaced by) 2016-07-28 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H4442 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S947 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S942 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2174 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2174.pdf |