MA H3071 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4610

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to crosswalks erected and maintained on public ways. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to crosswalk markings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4610
2015-12-30JointHearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4610 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2044 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2043 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2042 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
H1865 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1864 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback