MA H2044 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Rogers of Cambridge, a petition of David M. Rogers and others that the Department of Public Health be directed to promulgate regulations requiring that certain child care programs undergo routine radon testing. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting radon testing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2016-03-23HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-05-27JointHearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2043 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2042 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
H3071 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1865 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1864 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback