CA AB2862 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 115.7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Department of Consumer Affairs: African American applicants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 16). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 115.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |