MA S751 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the appointment of GAL to investigate. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the compensation of a guardian ad litem

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S724 (Similar To) 2015-06-22 - Accompanied H1354
S693 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2016
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1280 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
S1914 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S541 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1752 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1548 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback