MA S693 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the Berkshire County Regional Housing Authority. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the membership of Berkshire County Regional Housing Authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-25 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2016
2016-07-19SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2016-07-19HouseEnacted
2016-07-18HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2016-05-11HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-05-11HouseRules suspended
2016-05-11HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-04-25HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-04-21SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2016-04-21SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2016-03-28SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2016-03-28SenateReported favorably by committee
2015-06-29JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H3729 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2016
S712 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S692 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S717 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback