MA H1007 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4636

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to expand the determination of need threshold. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the determination of need threshold

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4636
2016-05-02HouseAdopted, in concurrence
2016-04-28SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday June 22, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H4636 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S506 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2359
H1008 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1146 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1189 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1149 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S598 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S2213 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback