MA H4636 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

The financing and delivery of health care in the commonwealth

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The financing and delivery of health care in the commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2016-09-26HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2016-09-26HouseAccompanied by H528, H989, H993, H1007, H1018, H2203 and H4202
2016-09-26HouseReported from the committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H528 (Replaces) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H989 (Replaces) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H993 (Replaces) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H1007 (Replaces) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H1018 (Replaces) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H2203 (Replaces) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H4202 (Replaces) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
S1972 (Similar To) 2015-09-24 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #168 (YEAS 34 - NAYS 4)
S2074 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2360 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2356 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback