MA S598 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2382

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to hospital closures and health planning. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to hospital closures and health planning

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2382
2016-05-02HouseAdopted, in concurrence
2016-05-02HouseHouse concurred
2016-04-29SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday June 22, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2382 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1103 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2370
H1896 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1146 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1122 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied S1123
S1169 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1148 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback