MA S2213 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1189
Note: Replaces legislation H4113

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 7 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to Acute-care hospitals,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2213).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent death and disability from stroke

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-05-05SenateAccompanied by H4113
2016-04-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2016-04-07SenateNew draft of S1189
2016-04-07SenateReported from the committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S1189 (Replaces) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
H4113 (Replaces) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S2213
S2075 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2015
H1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
S1048 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S1149 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S991 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback