MA S1189 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2213

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to Acute-care hospitals. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent death and disability from stroke

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2213
2015-11-30JointHearing scheduled for 12/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2213 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1048 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
H1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
S2075 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2015
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S1149 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback