MA S506 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2359

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide greater fairness in insurance policies. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For greater fairness in insurance policies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2359
2016-03-21HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2016-03-17SenateAmendment adopted, pending concurrence
2016-03-16HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-10-09JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2359 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S427 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S414
S446 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2069
S1541 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1974
S1878 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S383 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S1392 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S203 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2247
S949 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback