MA S2359 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S506
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide greater fairness in insurance policies, report the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2359).
Title
Financial services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied by S506 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S506 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2359
S2318 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2448 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2478 (Similar To) 2016-08-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2156 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2214 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S2199 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S2365 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S422 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2015-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2318 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2448 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2478 (Similar To) 2016-08-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2156 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2214 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S2199 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S2365 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S422 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2015-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2359 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2359.pdf |