MA H1008 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4622

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to payments to ambulatory surgical centers, specialty health care providers and laboratories. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to parity in assessments by the health care safety net fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-22HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4622
2016-05-02HouseAdopted, in concurrence
2016-04-28SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday June 22, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H4622 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S529 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1544 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S1188 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H1009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S1169 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S1171 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback