MA S1311 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1280

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to police training. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to police training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-11SenateBill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-04-11SenateAccompanied by S1280
2016-01-28JointHearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1280 (Replaces) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
S1258 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
S1189 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S1244 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1019 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2053
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S827 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1661 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback