CA AB3161 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 757, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 757, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1279.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: patient safety and antidiscrimination.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Assembly - AB 3161 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3161 Bonta et al. By Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3161 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3161 Bonta et al. By Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3161 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 757, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1279.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |