CA SB1002 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1524 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: prohibited persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1002 Blakespear et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1002 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Zbur (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1002 Blakespear et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2024-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5675.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6718.) Ordered to the Senate.
2024-08-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-22AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2024-08-07AssemblyAugust 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2024-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4178.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-05-20SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2024-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3967.) (May 16).
2024-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2024-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2024-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2024-03-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3351.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
2024-02-28SenateSet for hearing March 19.
2024-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on PUB S.
2024-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1524Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8103Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002#93CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1002

Bill Comments

feedback