MA S1646 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 228 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 228 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land in the city of Boston to the Church of the Nazarene Friends of the Humbles and the Greater Boston Nazarene Compassionate Center. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the conveyance of a certain parcel of land in the city of Boston to the Haitian Church of the Nazarene Friends of the Humbles and the Greater Boston Nazarene Compassionate Center
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 228 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #680 [Yeas 38 to Nays 0] |
2016-08-01 | House | Enacted 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 559) |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-31 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in 222 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2015-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1639 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1707 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1935 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2016
S1999 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2016
S2182 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2272
S1707 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1935 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2016
S1999 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2016
S2182 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2272
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1646 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1646.pdf |