MA S1648 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote purchasing from social enterprises by governmental bodies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To promote purchasing from social enterprises by governmental bodies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2806 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2198 (Similar To) 2015-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3081 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2871 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied S1767
H935 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2394 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2198 (Similar To) 2015-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3081 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2871 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied S1767
H935 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2394 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1648 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1648.pdf |