MA H2394 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to workers’ compensation payments for certain court officers injured as a result of acts of violence in a courtroom or other public area. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the officers of the court
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2045 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H2808 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1562 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3074 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H1563 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2808 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1562 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3074 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H1563 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2394 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2394.pdf |