CA AB1122 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 12 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 654.4 to the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to vessels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial harbor craft: equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Special Consent AB1122 Bains By Alvarado-Gil (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1122 Bains Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2024-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2024-05-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-05-20SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2024-05-08SenateRe-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q.
2024-05-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-09-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2023-09-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-13SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-09-13SenateOrdered to third reading.
2023-09-13SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2023-09-13SenateJoint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Page 2763.)
2023-09-13SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2023-09-13AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2023-09-13AssemblyWithdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2688.).
2023-09-08SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-14SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2023-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1761.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2023-05-18AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
2023-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2023-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-03-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2023-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Harbors and Navigation Code654.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122#93AMD
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1122

Bill Comments

feedback