CA AB1782 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 34176.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local government.
Title
Redevelopment: successor agencies: Low and Moderate Income Housing Asset Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1782 Ta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34176.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |