MA S1167 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to tests of newborn children for treatable disorders or diseases. Public Health.
Title
Relative to tests of newborn children for treatable disorders or diseases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2199 |
2015-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
H2019 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S988 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H2320 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1398 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4269 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2019 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S988 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H2320 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1398 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4269 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1167 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1167.pdf |