MA H2019 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4242
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to infectious disease control. Public Health.
Title
Relative to infectious disease control
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. David Vieira [R] | Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4242 |
2015-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S988 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H2107 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2356 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S1197 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S658 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
S988 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H2107 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2356 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S1197 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S658 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2019 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2019.pdf |